CO HJR1023 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Summary
May As Stroke Awareness Month
Title
May As Stroke Awareness Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-06 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to | |
2011-05-03 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-02 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-02 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B002F8C3F3BF417A8725784C005FA16F?Open |