CO HJR1019 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
Lupus Awareness Month
Title
Lupus Awareness Month
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Sen. Cheri Jahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-03 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to | |
2011-05-02 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-27 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-27 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/89077FDDC0F655B98725783F006E0B30?Open |