CO HJR1017 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Summary
Balanced Budget Constitutional Amendment
Title
Balanced Budget Constitutional Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Joint Resolution 11-1017 and reverse the previous roll call vote (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Joint Resolution 11-1017 and reverse the previous roll call vote (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Joint Resolution 11-1017 and reverse the previous roll call vote (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Joint Resolution 11-1017 and reverse the previous roll call vote (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Joint Resolution 11-1017 and reverse the previous roll call vote (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-04-21 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2011-04-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-15 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-15 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |