CO HJR1015 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
Child Abuse Prevention Month
Title
Child Abuse Prevention Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-04-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to | |
2011-04-13 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-08 | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2011 | |
2011-04-08 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0D2B8EF0C873CF768725783100722AD8?Open |