CO HJR1008 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the declaration of a state fiscal emergency pursuant to section 21 (7) of article X of the state constitution.
Title
Declaring Fiscal Emergency For Use Of Tobacco Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Referred to Full House for final action. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-05-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |