CO HJR1007 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Military Appreciation Day
Title
Military Appreciation Day
Sponsors
Rep. Su Ryden [D] | Rep. Jon Keyser [R] | Sen. Ray Scott [R] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/06/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2015-01-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-01-29 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |