CO HJR1007 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Summary
Water Projects Eligibility Lists
Title
Water Projects Eligibility Lists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Joint Resolution 13-1007 to the House for final action (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Joint Resolution 13-1007 to the House for final action (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Joint Resolution 13-1007 to the House for final action (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-02-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2013-01-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-01-23 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |