CO HJR1007 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Summary
Fallen Heroes Memorial Resolution
Title
Fallen Heroes Memorial Resolution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-02-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2012-01-30 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-01-24 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-01-23 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to | |
2012-01-23 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-01-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/071B8E8D7AAB6E1387257989006809F9?Open |