CO HCR1002 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - House Third Reading Lost
Status: Introduced on March 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - House Third Reading Lost
Summary
GA Authority To Enact Addl Ed Funding
Title
GA Authority To Enact Addl Ed Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved House Concurrent Resolution 10-1002 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Assigned Act No. 2010-221. | |
2010-05-12 | House Third Reading Lost | |
2010-05-10 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-19 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |