CO HB1440 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Admin Flexibility For School Districts And Schools
Title
Admin Flexibility For School Districts And Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1440, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1440, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1440 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1440, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1440, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1440 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-09 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2016-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-04-27 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |