CO HB1425 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning hospital patient visitation rights during the COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Hospital Patient Visitation Rights During COVID-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1425 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1425, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1425, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 20 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1425 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1425, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1425, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 20 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-06-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |