CO HB1399 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the temporary suspension of statutory allocations of limited gaming tax revenues, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing appropriations.
Title
Suspend Limited Gaming Tax Transfers To Cash Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1399, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1399 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1399, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1399 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2020-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-29 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 06/01/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-05-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
Subjects
Business & Economic Development
Fiscal Policy & Taxes
Gaming, Lottery, & Racing
Local Government
State Government
State Revenue & Budget
Fiscal Policy & Taxes
Gaming, Lottery, & Racing
Local Government
State Government
State Revenue & Budget