CO HB1396 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the transfer of money from the general fund to the advanced industries acceleration cash fund, and, in connection therewith, extending the "Colorado Bioscience and Clean Technology Innovation Reinvestment Act" for an additional eight years.
Title
General Fund Transfer to Advanced Industries Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1396 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1396 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1396 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1396 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2024-04-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |