CO HB1394 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Aligning Issues Around At-risk Persons
Title
Aligning Issues Around At-risk Persons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1394, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.012 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.014 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1394, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.012 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.014 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1394, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1394, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1394, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1394, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.012 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.014 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1394, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.012 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.014 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1394, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1394, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1394, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-05 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2016-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-04-26 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Re-referred to Health, Insurance, & Environment - No Amendments |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |