CO HB1388 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning statutory provisions on money from the general fund for programs operated by the department of human services, and, in connection therewith, reducing an appropriation.
Title
Statutory Provisions Divert General Fund Reversions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1388 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1388 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1388 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1388 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2020-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-29 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 06/01/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-05-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |