CO HB1381 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requirements For A School Closure Plan
Title
Requirements For A School Closure Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1381, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1381, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1381, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1381, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-07 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2014-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-21 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |