CO HB1371 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
Pending: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 1 in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
Pending: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 1 in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning regulation of massage facilities by local governments in accordance with statewide requirements, and, in connection therewith, requiring a local government to establish a process that requires periodic criminal background checks for massage facility operators, owners, and employees.
Title
More Uniform Local Massage Facilities Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1371 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1371, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1371, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1371 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1371, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1371, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2024-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |