CO HB1371 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning capital construction budget items, and, in connection therewith, codifying the three-year period that capital construction budget items remain available and clarifying the deadlines for the submission of capital construction budget requests, budget request amendments, and budget request amendments that are related to a request for a supplemental appropriation.
Title
Capital Construction Budget Items
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1371 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1371, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1371, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1371 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1371, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1371, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |