CO HB1362 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a plan for addressing statewide infrastructure needs.
Title
Plan For Addressing Statewide Infrastructure Needs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Postpone House Bill 17-1362 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Reconsider motion to refer House Bill 17-1362 to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1362 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1362 to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Reconsider motion to refer House Bill 17-1362 to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1362 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1362 to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2017-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |