CO HB1360 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning allowing a person with a subsequent criminal case to seal a low-level offense.
Title
Allow Criminal Record Sealing Subsequent Offense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1360 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1360 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1360 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1360, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1360, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1360 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1360 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1360 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1360, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1360, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1360 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2017-05-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-04 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |