CO HB1360 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Continue Regulation Direct-entry Midwives
Title
Continue Regulation Direct-entry Midwives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment K) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment J) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment K) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment J) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1360, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1360, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to amendment L.002 to include a woman who has had a myomectomy (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1360, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment K) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment J) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment K) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment J) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1360, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1360, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to amendment L.002 to include a woman who has had a myomectomy (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1360, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-04-29 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2016-04-29 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2016-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |