CO HB1359 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - House Third Reading Lay on the Table-Deemed Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - House Third Reading Lay on the Table-Deemed Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit Internet Lottery
Title
Prohibit Internet Lottery
Sponsors
Sen. Cheri Jahn [D] | Rep. Glenn Vaad [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1359, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1359, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1359, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | House Third Reading Lay on the Table-Deemed Lost | |
2012-05-07 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-05-04 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-05-02 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-30 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |