CO HB1357 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unspent Proceeds Of FML Lease-Purchase Agreements
Title
Unspent Proceeds Of FML Lease-Purchase Agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1357 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1357 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1357 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1357 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1357 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1357 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1357 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2012-05-07 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-05-07 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy | |
2012-05-07 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-04 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2012-05-02 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-30 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |