CO HB1357 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
False Claims Act
Title
False Claims Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1357, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1357, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1357, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1357, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1357, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1357, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-10 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance | |
2010-04-30 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Finance + Appropriations | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-26 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-20 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-16 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-18 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |