CO HB1356 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthen Penalty Authority Oil & Gas Commn
Title
Strengthen Penalty Authority Oil & Gas Commn
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Foote [D] | Sen. Matt Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1356 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1356 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1356, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1356 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1356 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1356 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1356, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1356 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1356 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2014-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-16 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-09 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance |
2014-04-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |