CO HB1355 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reentry Programs For Adult Parolees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reentry Programs For Adult Parolees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1355 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1355 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1355, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001This is a conceptual amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1355, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-06HouseGovernor Signed
2014-05-12HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-05-12HouseSent to the Governor
2014-05-09HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-05-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-04-28SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2014-04-21SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2014-04-21HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-17HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-17HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-04-15HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2014-04-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/535B1BDD5BE99FC187257CA7005A703E?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/535B1BDD5BE99FC187257CA7005A703E/$FILE/1355_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/535B1BDD5BE99FC187257CA7005A703E/$FILE/1355jud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/535B1BDD5BE99FC187257CA7005A703E/$FILE/1355app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/535B1BDD5BE99FC187257CA7005A703E/$FILE/1355_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/535B1BDD5BE99FC187257CA7005A703E/$FILE/1355_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/535B1BDD5BE99FC187257CA7005A703E/$FILE/1355_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/535B1BDD5BE99FC187257CA7005A703E/$FILE/1355_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/535B1BDD5BE99FC187257CA7005A703E/$FILE/1355_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9FEF3382E86B10E987257CBB007B0186
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E1B08D6C675126AB87257CBD004C33E4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B31FA230A181098D87257CBD004C3B4A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/14B3C111CF272ABF87257CBB007AE069
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E465E3B097E21EB087257CC800813D5C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/759484F13A7E802887257CCA00658A07

Bill Comments 750

feedback