CO HB1351 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a temporary reduction in the total amount of road user charges to be imposed during state fiscal years 2022-23 and 2023-24, and, in connection therewith, temporarily reducing gas prices and making an appropriation.
Title
Temporarily Reduce Road User Charges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1351 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1351, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1351, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1351, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1351, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1351 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1351, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1351, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1351, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1351, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-22 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-21 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |