CO HB1348 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 9:00 am in Room 0112
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 9:00 am in Room HCR 0112
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 9:00 am in Room 0112
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 9:00 am in Room HCR 0112
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement to securely store a firearm in a vehicle.
Title
Secure Firearm Storage in a Vehicle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House: Senate Amendments Not Cncr (Y: 34 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.006) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.004) (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.003) (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.003) (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.002) (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.002) (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.001) (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.001) (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1348, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.047 (Attachment D). (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1348, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.004) (Y: 18 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-03-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.003) (Y: 15 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-03-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 15 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-03-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 15 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1348, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1348, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.006) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.004) (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.003) (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.003) (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.002) (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.002) (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.001) (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.001) (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1348, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.047 (Attachment D). (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1348, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.004) (Y: 18 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-03-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.003) (Y: 15 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-03-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 15 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-03-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 15 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1348, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1348, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2024-04-23 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/19/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2024-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-03-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |