CO HB1341 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
concerning idling that is at least as stringent as, but not less stringent than, the state standard.
Title
State Vehicle Idling Standard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 24-1341 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1341, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1341, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 24-1341 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1341, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1341, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/08/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2024-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |