CO HB1341 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance Title Register Vehicles Funds
Title
Insurance Title Register Vehicles Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1341 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1341 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1341 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1341 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | ||
2010-05-26 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-23 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-03-23 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation + Appropriations | |
2010-03-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-19 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-19 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-09 | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-02-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Appropriations |