CO HB1339 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorization for the issuance of low-cost ratepayer-backed bonds, and creation of the Colorado energy impact assistance authority to mitigate the impacts of power plant retirements on Colorado workers and communities.
Title
Colorado Energy Impact Assistance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Hansen [D] | Rep. Daneya Esgar [D] | Sen. Matt Jones [D] | Sen. Andy Kerr [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1339 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1339 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1339, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1339, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1339 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1339, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1339, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 05/01/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |