CO HB1334 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Severence Tax Funding Agricultural Energy Projects
Title
Severence Tax Funding Agricultural Energy Projects
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Becker [R] | Sen. Mary Hodge [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1334, unamended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1334, unamended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1334 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1334 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1334, unamended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1334, unamended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1334 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1334 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Second Reading Special Orders - Passed | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-04-25 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy | |
2012-04-24 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-23 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2012-04-19 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-17 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-04 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |