CO HB1332 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prohibitions on discrimination in housing based on source of income, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Prohibit Housing Discrimination Source Of Income
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1332, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1332 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1332, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 34 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.007) (Y: 32 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1332, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1332, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1332 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1332, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1332 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1332, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 34 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.007) (Y: 32 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1332, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1332, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1332 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-13 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-06-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-06 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-05-26 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |