CO HB1331 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning expanding the use of open educational resources at public institutions of higher education, and, in connection therewith, creating the Colorado open educational resources council, creating a grant program to support the creation and use of open educational resources, and making an appropriation.
Title
Higher Education Open Educational Resources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1331 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1331, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1331, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1331 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1331, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1331, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |