CO HB1330 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications of processes to obtain permits for activities that impact air quality.
Title
Air Quality Permitting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1330, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1330, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1330, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Energy & Environment: Reconsider (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1330, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1330, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1330, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1330, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1330, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Energy & Environment: Reconsider (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1330, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1330, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1330, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |