CO HB1329 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Solid Waste User Fees
Title
Solid Waste User Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1329 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1329 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1329, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1329 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1329 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1329, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-04 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-23 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance | |
2010-03-09 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Finance + Appropriations | |
2010-03-03 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-02 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-01 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-24 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |