CO HB1323 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the manner of dress during school graduation ceremonies.
Title
School Graduation Attire
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.006) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1323 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1323, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment J) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.006) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1323 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1323, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment J) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-19 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-04-14 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2024-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |