CO HB1318 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the outdoor equity grant program, and, in connection therewith, funding the grant program from lottery money, and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create Outdoor Equity Grant Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1318 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1318 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1318, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1318, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1318, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-03SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-03SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2021-05-25HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-24HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-24HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-20HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1318
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1318_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1318_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1318_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1318_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1318_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1318_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1318_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1318_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1318_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1318_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6337e4b357c6e8e4872586db0080c417-hb21-1318-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7fe6108fd3f6296f872586df0055d3e6-hb21-1318-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7fe6108fd3f6296f872586df0055d3e6-hb21-1318-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1318vote5f0618
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e340865074bdf8db872586e20002a03f-hb21-1318-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6337e4b357c6e8e4872586db0080c417-hb21-1318-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9ccff1f65af66347872586e900500f6f-hb21-1318-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1318vote5c624a

Bill Comments 750

feedback