CO HB1318 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Charitable Solicitations Regulation
Title
Charitable Solicitations Regulation
Sponsors
Rep. Cole Wist [R] | Sen. Linda Newell [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1318 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1318, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1318 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1318 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1318 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1318 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1318, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1318 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1318 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1318 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/13/2016 - No Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-22 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |