CO HB1313 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning housing requirements for agricultural workers during a public health emergency.
Title
Agricultural Housing Public Health COVID-19 Emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 22-1313 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 22-1313 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2022-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-07 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-04 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |