CO HB1304 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-12)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to establish a unified early childhood system in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, creating the department of early childhood and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Childhood System

Sponsors

Rep. Alec Garnett [D]Rep. Emily Sirota [D]Sen. Janet Buckner [D]Sen. Stephen Fenberg [D]
Rep. Judith Amabile [D]Rep. Jennifer Bacon [D]Rep. Adrienne Benavidez [D]Rep. Tracey Bernett [D]
Rep. Shannon Bird [D]Rep. Andrew Boesenecker [D]Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D]Rep. Lisa Cutter [D]
Rep. Monica Duran [D]Rep. Daneya Esgar [D]Rep. Thomas Exum [D]Rep. Meg Froelich [D]
Rep. Serena Gonzales-Gutierrez [D]Rep. Matt Gray [D]Rep. Leslie Herod [D]Rep. Edith Hooton [D]
Rep. Dominique Jackson [D]Rep. Iman Jodeh [D]Rep. Chris Kennedy [D]Rep. Cathy Kipp [D]
Rep. Susan Lontine [D]Rep. Julie McCluskie [D]Rep. Karen McCormick [D]Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D]
Rep. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D]Rep. Kyle Mullica [D]Rep. David Ortiz [D]Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D]
Rep. Dylan Roberts [D]Rep. Shane Sandridge [R]Rep. Marc Snyder [D]Rep. Tom Sullivan [D]
Rep. Kerry Tipper [D]Rep. Brianna Titone [D]Rep. Donald Valdez [D]Rep. Alex Valdez [D]
Rep. Michael Weissman [D]Rep. Steven Woodrow [D]Rep. Mary Young [D]Sen. Jeff Bridges [D]
Sen. James Coleman [D]Sen. John Cooke [R]Sen. Donald Coram [R]Sen. Jessie Danielson [D]
Sen. Kerry Donovan [D]Sen. Rhonda Fields [D]Sen. Leroy Garcia [D]Sen. Joann Ginal [D]
Sen. Julie Gonzales [D]Sen. Chris Hansen [D]Sen. Chris Holbert [R]Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D]
Sen. Barbara Kirkmeyer [R]Sen. Chris Kolker [D]Sen. Pete Lee [D]Sen. Paul Lundeen [R]
Sen. Dominick Moreno [D]Sen. Brittany Pettersen [D]Sen. Kevin Priola [R]Sen. Robert Rankin [R]
Sen. Robert Rodriguez [D]Sen. Ray Scott [R]Sen. Cleave Simpson [R]Sen. Jerry Sonnenberg [R]
Sen. Tammy Story [D]Sen. Faith Winter [D]Sen. Rob Woodward [R]Sen. Rachel Zenzinger [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1304 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1304, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1304, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1304, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1304, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1304, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-07SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-02SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-06-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-25SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2021-05-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-22HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-21HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-21HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-13HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1304
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1304_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1304_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1304_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1304_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1304_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1304_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1304_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1304_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1304_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1304_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1304_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1304_L.009.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1304_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1304_hs2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1304_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1304_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/433ed3ee0f846818872586d400703bad-hb21-1304-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8fc1cd3c15afcb2d872586dc004bd272-hb21-1304-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1304vote5a2d96
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bda95c372d1a0f4d872586e100120ca4-hb21-1304-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7fc191f0e32ef336872586e3005147d8-hb21-1304-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bda95c372d1a0f4d872586e100120ca4-hb21-1304-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bda95c372d1a0f4d872586e100120ca4-hb21-1304-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1304vote5e0eab
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/433ed3ee0f846818872586d400703bad-hb21-1304-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1304vote1aac97
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1304vote1abda3

Bill Comments 750

feedback