CO HB1302 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a grant program for small businesses affected by economic hardship caused by the COVID-19 pandemic, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Continue COVID-19 Small Business Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1302 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1302 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1302, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1302, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1302 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1302 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1302, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1302, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2021-05-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-22 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-19 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |