CO HB1298 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of electric motor vehicle charging stations for parking a motor vehicle.
Title
Electric Motor Vehicle Charging Station Parking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1298 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1298, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Amendment L.002 (Attachment G) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1298, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1298 to the Committee on Transportation & Local Government. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1298 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1298, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Amendment L.002 (Attachment G) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1298, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1298 to the Committee on Transportation & Local Government. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2019-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-15 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Transportation & Local Government |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |