CO HB1297 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide Internet Portal Authority
Title
Statewide Internet Portal Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1297 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1297 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1297 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1297 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1297 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-28 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2011-04-26 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-25 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-20 | House Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-13 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation |