CO HB1296 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changing the statute of limitations applicable to civil actions alleging sexual misconduct for which the statute of limitations has not yet run as of January 1, 2021.
Title
Civil Action Statute Of Limitations Sexual Assault
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 20-1296 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1296 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1296 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-05-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/11/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |