CO HB1292 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement for reporting revenues derived from sports betting activity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Report Revenues From Sports Betting Activity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1292 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1292, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1292, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-24SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2021-05-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-18HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-17HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-12HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-05HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2021-04-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1292
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1292_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1292_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1292_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1292_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1292_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1292_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1292_L.002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1292_00.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5096c7b2ed9b0c48872586d3006a4d6f-hb21-1292-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1292vote53f785
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5096c7b2ed9b0c48872586d3006a4d6f-hb21-1292-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7fbb58b87da92f67872586df0075ce1d-hb21-1292-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1292vote585f4a

Bill Comments 750

feedback