CO HB1291 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability to store water at an alternate place of storage if the historical consumptive use of the water right has already been quantified in a previous change of the water right.
Title
Alternate Storage Not Change If Already Quantified
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1291 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1291, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1291, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1291 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1291, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1291, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2017-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-17 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |