CO HB1289 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-7)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-7)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning broadband deployment, and, in connection therewith, codifying the Colorado broadband office in the office of information technology; creating the digital inclusion grant program, the broadband stimulus grant program, and the interconnectivity grant program; and making an appropriation.
Title
Funding For Broadband Deployment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1289, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1289 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1289 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1289, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt Amendment L.006 (Attachment F). (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt Amendment L.005 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt Amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1289, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1289, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1289 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1289 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1289, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt Amendment L.006 (Attachment F). (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt Amendment L.005 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt Amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1289, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2021-05-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |