CO HB1288 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the Colorado startup loan program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Colorado Startup Loan Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1288, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1288, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1288 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1288 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1288, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1288, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1288, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1288, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1288, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1288 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1288 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1288, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1288, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1288, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2021-05-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-17 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-05 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |