CO HB1280 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-9)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-9)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the codification of the Colorado access to justice commission.
Title
Colorado Access To Justice Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1280 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1280 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |